This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:37:48 (UTC).

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY vs MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MENDOZA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3472

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JOSEPH MENDOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Frederick Haines

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

07/27/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Department Assignment

07/27/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000)

07/27/2021: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

07/27/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/20/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/04/2021: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10/04/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/27/2021; Fine Description: Check #62853 Receipt No.: 20210727-00308.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000); Filed By: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Insurance Coverage (Under $10,000) of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAINES TODD FREDERICK