This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 11:01:31 (UTC).

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE vs AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2093

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

Defendants

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

EDWARD V. SARMIENTO

CHRISTINE K. SARMIENTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIGITTE CASTRO

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

03/28/2022: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

03/28/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

03/28/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

04/04/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/04/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/04/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220404-00473.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/04/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220404-00473.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 05/27/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-6, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant