This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 01:45:41 (UTC).

THOMPSON vs BAUSCH

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAUSCH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0333

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

WILLIE WILLIAMS

Defendants

DALE BAUSCH

LOWES HIW INC

LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARY L CARUSO

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages 1. General Negligence 2. Negligent Hiring, Supervision, and/or Retention 3. Premises Liability 4. Loss of Consortium

01/25/2022: Complaint for Damages 1. General Negligence 2. Negligent Hiring, Supervision, and/or Retention 3. Premises Liability 4. Loss of Consortium

Summons Issued and Filed

01/25/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

01/25/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Department Assignment

01/26/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

02/10/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

02/10/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

03/08/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

Demand for trial by Jury on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

03/08/2022: Demand for trial by Jury on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

Notice of Document Return.

03/18/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Plaintiff's notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

03/14/2022: Plaintiff's notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

03/22/2022: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/24/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220324-00492.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220318-00993.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220318-00993.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220311-01374.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220311-01374.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for trial by Jury on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; Filed By: LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220126-01354.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220126-01354.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages 1. General Negligence 2. Negligent Hiring, Supervision, and/or Retention 3. Premises Liability 4. Loss of Consortium; Filed By: PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON; WILLIE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of PATRICIA ANN THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE'S HIW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARUSO MARY LEE