This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 09:19:03 (UTC).

THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC vs PLATINUM FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PLATINUM FINANCIAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson Lucky and Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1547

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jackson Lucky

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

Defendants

PLATINUM FINANCIAL CORPORATION

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIM OR ANY CLOUD UPON PLAINTIFFS CLAIM THERETO

ELIZABETH TUFANO

RHEA TETLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard D. Marks

Defendant Attorneys

John Dana Mitchellweiler

John H. Caballero

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

08/04/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

07/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer to Verified Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

06/04/2021: Answer to Verified Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Declaration of The Custodian of Records for Val-Chris Investments, Inc.

06/04/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Declaration of The Custodian of Records for Val-Chris Investments, Inc.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

06/04/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

05/17/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

Additional Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Sale of Real Property

05/10/2021: Additional Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction Enjoining the Sale of Real Property

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of 1. Platinum Financial Corporation's Further Opposition to the OSC re Preliminary Injunctions Enjoining the Sale of Real Property, 2. Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Helen Hammond and Elias Teshome

05/07/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of 1. Platinum Financial Corporation's Further Opposition to the OSC re Preliminary Injunctions Enjoining the Sale of Real Property, 2. Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Helen Hammond and Elias Teshome

Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Elias Teshome

05/07/2021: Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Elias Teshome

Platinum Financial Corporation's Further Response and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Opposition to the Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunctions Enjoining the Sale of Real Property;

05/07/2021: Platinum Financial Corporation's Further Response and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Opposition to the Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunctions Enjoining the Sale of Real Property;

Notice of Ruling of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction

04/29/2021: Notice of Ruling of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and OSC re Preliminary Injunction

Declaration of Elias Teshome in support of Ex Parte Application and Application for Preliminary Injunction

04/23/2021: Declaration of Elias Teshome in support of Ex Parte Application and Application for Preliminary Injunction

Declaration of Nancy D. Mendez in support of Ex Parte Application for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and providing ex parte notice to all relevant parties

04/23/2021: Declaration of Nancy D. Mendez in support of Ex Parte Application for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and providing ex parte notice to all relevant parties

Notice of Department Assignment

04/05/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

03/23/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/09/2021; Fine Description: No Fee Case Receipt No.: 20210709-00587.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Filed By: PLATINUM FINANCIAL CORPORATION; ELIZABETH TUFANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/29/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *5021 Receipt No.: 20210629-00281.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex-Parte Application for order temporary restraining order and order to show cause for preliminary injunction; Memorandum of points and authorities on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC; Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *7942 Receipt No.: 20210405-00357.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE TETLEY BUILDING, LLC; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 07/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Platinum Financial Trust, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS RICHARD D. ESQ.