This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/09/2022 at 06:29:01 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS vs KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O.G. Magno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4454

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER PERMANENTE RIVERSIDE MEDICAL CENTER

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES LLOYD WEST

Defendant Attorney

DEBORAH OLSEN DEBOER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

10/13/2022: Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

10/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

10/13/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

10/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

10/14/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

11/02/2022: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

11/29/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

11/29/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

11/29/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

11/29/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

Notice of Document Return.

12/07/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Answer to Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

12/07/2022: Answer to Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221207-02157.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221207-02157.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221207-02157.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221207-02157.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; Filed By: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC; KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/01/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221201-00838.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221014-01526.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221014-01526.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages; Filed By: THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS; YAPHET GIBBS GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of THE ESTATE OF ELLA GIBBS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant