This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 05:59:17 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs MCCUEN

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MCCUEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5440

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

SHANE P MCCUEN

REBECCA A MCCUEN

AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER

HSBC CREDIT CENTER, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISSA COUTTS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/06/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

12/06/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

11/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/06/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211206-00017.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/18/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint; Filed By: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC CREDIT CENTER,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Americas Wholesale Lender is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant