This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 09:12:15 (UTC).

TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC vs GUEVARA

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUEVARA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3817

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Defendants

SALOMON GUEVARA

CRUZ GUEVARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDRA I. TIBERI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

03/06/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Judgment by Default by Court Filed on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

02/17/2023: Judgment by Default by Court Filed on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Declaration of Sandra Tiberi in Support of Attorney's Fees

12/23/2022: Declaration of Sandra Tiberi in Support of Attorney's Fees

Declaration of Adam Boehm in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CC.P 585(d) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

12/23/2022: Declaration of Adam Boehm in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CC.P 585(d) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered) Request for Entry of Court Judgment on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

12/23/2022: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered) Request for Entry of Court Judgment on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

12/13/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

12/09/2022: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

12/09/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Notice of Document Return.

12/09/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

11/01/2022: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

09/26/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

Notice of Department Assignment

09/07/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

09/07/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/07/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/07/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/07/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Complaint for Money

09/07/2022: Complaint for Money

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01805.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01805.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01805.1; Paid: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230306-01805.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC; For/Against: For - TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC Against - SALOMON GUEVARA Against - CRUZ GUEVARA; Details; Principal: $45,140.22; Costs: $627.08; Accrued Interest: $14,469.60; Attorney Fees: $2,616.05; Other: $4,514.02; Subtotal Judgment: $67,366.97; Writ Fee: $80.00; Total: $67,446.97; Abstract of Judgment Issued on 03/06/2023; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Riverside on 03/06/2023 - expires on 09/02/2023; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Los Angeles on 03/06/2023 - expires on 09/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Court Filed on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221230-00393.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220907-02175.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220907-02175.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Money; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TBF FINANCIAL I, LLC; Disposition: Default Judgment by Court 02/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less