This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/26/2023 at 09:04:53 (UTC).

TAYLOR vs CITY OF RIVERSIDE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF RIVERSIDE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4134

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES TAYLOR

Defendants

CITY OF RIVERSIDE

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

RIVERSIDE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION

RIVERSIDE TRANSIT AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alejandro Manuel Valenzuela

Defendant Attorney

PATRICK M. DESMOND

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

01/25/2023: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Plaintiffs notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

01/23/2023: Plaintiffs notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

12/21/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

12/12/2022: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/05/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/05/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/05/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

12/01/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

12/01/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

12/01/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

11/23/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

11/23/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

11/23/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

09/29/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

09/22/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/22/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230125-02166.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230124-00199.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230124-00199.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiffs notice of posting jury fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/23/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20221223-00833.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/23/2022; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20221223-00833.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR; Filed By: RIVERSIDE TRANSIT AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221213-00090.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2022; Fine Description: Cash Receipt No.: 20220929-00578.1; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2022; Fine Description: Void / Reversal, Reason: Incorrect method of payment recorded Receipt No.: 20220929-00578.2; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2022; Fine Description: Check #511125 Receipt No.: 20220929-00593.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHARLES TAYLOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less