This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 00:56:50 (UTC).

TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP. vs BUDRON

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 TAYLOR, BEAN WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUDRON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4324

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP

Defendant

SHAFIC BUDRON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua P Friedman

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

09/23/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

09/23/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk

10/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk

Notice of Document Return.

10/13/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

10/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk; Filed By: SHAFIC BUDRON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: SHAFIC BUDRON; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.; Filed By: TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/23/2021; Fine Description: Check #5779 Receipt No.: 20210923-00665.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P