This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 16:32:18 (UTC).

TAP vs MASON

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 TAP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MASON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0364

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID TAP

LEAH APPLEWHITE

Defendants

FRANK MASON

WENDY MASON

CASSIDY MASON

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Lee O'Connor

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000)

05/10/2021: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

05/10/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

05/10/2021: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130)

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

05/10/2021: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance

05/10/2021: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance

Notice of Department Assignment

05/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

05/11/2021: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

06/08/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of DAVID TAP

06/08/2021: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of DAVID TAP

Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031)

06/08/2021: Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031)

Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

06/08/2021: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only

06/08/2021: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only

Writ of Possession Returned for County of Satisfied

07/01/2021: Writ of Possession Returned for County of Satisfied

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

06/08/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

06/08/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

06/08/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Writ of Possession Returned for County of Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Possession Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: Check #79908 Receipt No.: 20210610-00590.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Possession; Applies to: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of DAVID TAP; For/Against: For - LEAH APPLEWHITE For - DAVID TAP Against - CASSIDY MASON Against - FRANK MASON Against - WENDY MASON; Details; Writ Fee: $40.00; Possession; Premises Address: 27788 Almont Way Menifee, CA, 92585; Writ of Possession Issued for County: Riverside on 06/10/2021 - expires on 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: 10 Year Judgment Expiration; Expiration Date: 06/08/2031; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer by Clerk for Possession only; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of issuance of Writ of Possession (RI-CI002)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Judgment by Default by Clerk Restitution of Premises Only (RI-CI031)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of DAVID TAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper in unlawful detainer amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $270.00; Paid: $270.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0230 Receipt No.: 20210511-00161.1; Paid: $270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerks Notice of Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verification by Landlord Regarding Rental Assistance; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations (Unlawful Detainer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons - Unlawful Detainer - Eviction Issued and Filed (SUM-130); Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000); Filed By: DAVID TAP; LEAH APPLEWHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Unlawful Detainer - Residential (Under $10,000) of DAVID TAP; Disposition: Clerk's Default Judgment 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR