This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/16/2022 at 22:45:02 (UTC).

SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION vs COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4707

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REBECCA REED

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

12/14/2022: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

12/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/14/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

12/15/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221215-01874.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221215-01874.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/12/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SUN CITY SHADOW HILLS ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less