This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 09:11:42 (UTC).

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC. vs QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Irma Asberry and Carol A. Greene. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3122

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Irma Asberry

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

KAPITUS

Defendants

QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT

TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL ANDREW LEVIN

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL E. BUBMAN

 

Court Documents

Receipt for Record Returned 30-2022-01288858

11/02/2022: Receipt for Record Returned 30-2022-01288858

Certification of Transfer of Electronic Document(s)

10/25/2022: Certification of Transfer of Electronic Document(s)

Receipt for Record

10/25/2022: Receipt for Record

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

01/23/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause Failure to Pay Transfer Fees STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN

11/28/2022: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause Failure to Pay Transfer Fees STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

10/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

10/10/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

Notice of Document Return.

09/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Stipulation to Transfer Venue; and Order Thereon

09/27/2022: Stipulation to Transfer Venue; and Order Thereon

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Ex Parte Application

09/27/2022: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Ex Parte Application

Declaration of Scott H. Noskin RE: Notice in Support of Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue

09/26/2022: Declaration of Scott H. Noskin RE: Notice in Support of Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue

Declaration of Michael E. Bubman in Support of Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue

09/26/2022: Declaration of Michael E. Bubman in Support of Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue

Notice of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

09/26/2022: Notice of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application to Approve Stipulation to Transfer Venue on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

08/16/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

08/02/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

Notice of Department Assignment

07/27/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

07/27/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause Failure to Pay Transfer Fees STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause Failure to Pay Transfer Fees STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC., QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC, TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Receipt for Record Returned 30-2022-01288858

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Change of Venue (GC70618) (GC70618); Amount: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/25/2022; Fine Description: Check #10269 Receipt No.: 20221025-00557.1; Paid: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certification of Transfer of Electronic Document(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Receipt for Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/13/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221013-00429.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.; Filed By: QUALITY HEALTHCARE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC; TRACY WILLIAMS BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220727-02296.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220727-02296.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint; Filed By: STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC.; Disposition: Change of Venue 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less