This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 00:35:46 (UTC).

STILWELL vs HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 STILWELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0492

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAKE STILWELL

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

THE HOME DEPOT

JOSEPH GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW L. BREMONT

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

01/31/2023: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/31/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BLAKE STILWELL

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BLAKE STILWELL

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

02/02/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/02/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

02/02/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-01684.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-00277.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-00277.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230202-00277.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/01/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BLAKE STILWELL; Filed By: BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed By: BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of BLAKE STILWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less