This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:41:25 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs WILLIAMMEE

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAMMEE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marie E. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3791

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JOSHUA DAVID WILLIAMMEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan Mary Benson

Defendant Attorney

Willis Jackson King, III

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

10/05/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/16/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/11/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued and Filed

04/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

04/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

04/30/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/07/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

05/07/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: JOSHUA DAVID WILLIAMMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210617-00018.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: JOSHUA DAVID WILLIAMMEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/07/2021; Fine Description: Check #11779 Receipt No.: 20210507-00176.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M