This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 14:45:46 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs NEW ERA TOWING & TRANSPORT, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NEW ERA TOWING TRANSPORT, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4691

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

NEW ERA TOWING & TRANSPORT, LLC

JAVIER M. JAIME, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUSAN M. BENSON

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of

11/21/2022: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/21/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

11/21/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

11/23/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

11/23/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Department Assignment

11/23/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

11/23/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221123-01205.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221123-01205.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/20/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of; Filed By: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M