Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 09:16:01 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND vs BROWN

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2471

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

EUGENE ALEXANDER BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathalie Tang

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/08/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

05/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/21/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

05/21/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210608-00244.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/20/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANG NATHALIE