Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 13:19:17 (UTC).

SQUAR vs RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 SQUAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2404

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARA SQUAR

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

RALPHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fernando Brito, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Russell Sterling Fuerst

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR

05/24/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/18/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR

05/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR

Summons Issued and Filed

05/17/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/17/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

05/17/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/25/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1792 Receipt No.: 20210525-00657.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR; Filed By: RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/18/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1001 Receipt No.: 20210518-00166.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR; Filed By: MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARA SQUAR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fuerst, Russell S