This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 02:50:41 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY vs COMPETITIVE EDGE ELECTRIC, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COMPETITIVE EDGE ELECTRIC, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6161

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Defendants

COMPETITIVE EDGE ELECTRIC, INC

GRANITE CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED

GRANITE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

CITY OF COACHELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAZILA Y LEVY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

11/23/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/21/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211221-00235.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/22/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANITE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY NAZILA Y. ESQ.