This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 13:33:48 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & VAMADEVA

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VAMADEVA was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1915

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

CLEVELIN REALTY CORPORATION

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TITLE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

CHARLES VAMADEVA

ROSA VAMADEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford B Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

05/28/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/19/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

10/08/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

08/05/2021: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

08/05/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment

08/05/2021: Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment

Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application for Default Judgment

08/05/2021: Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application for Default Judgment

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/20/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Request for Dismissal

08/04/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/29/2021: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Ruling re: Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/28/2021: Notice of Ruling re: Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for order for prejudgment possession of plaintiff Southern California Edison Company by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/28/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for order for prejudgment possession of plaintiff Southern California Edison Company by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Order of Prejudgment Possession

07/28/2021: Order of Prejudgment Possession

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/19/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession of Southern California Edison Company on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

07/12/2021: Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession of Southern California Edison Company on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Document Return.

07/06/2021: Notice of Document Return.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application for Default Judgment; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion for order for prejudgment possession of plaintiff Southern California Edison Company on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210427-00259.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUHN BRADFORD B.