This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 15:57:52 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & THE BLUE-SKY INSTITUTE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY THE BLUE-SKY INSTITUTE LLC was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0168

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

GUY TAYLOR

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY, CUSTODIAN FBO BRUCE LAWRENCE IRA

ROBERT CHATENEVER

THE HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF GUY TAYLOR DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

ANTONI FAMILY 2012 REVOCABLE TRUST

FRANCES M TAYLOR

THE HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF JACK A KADERA DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TITLE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

THE HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF LOIS GALE MOULTON DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

THE HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF ROBERTA F THOMAS DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY

THE HEIRS OR DEVISEES OF MARY ANN KADERA DECEASED AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

MARY ANN KADERA

JACK A KADERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford Beau Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/09/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/09/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/08/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/08/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/08/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

02/08/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/15/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

04/13/2021: Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application

04/13/2021: Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application

Application for Order for Publication of Summons

04/13/2021: Application for Order for Publication of Summons

Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application

04/13/2021: Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

06/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment

06/22/2021: Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment

Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application for Default Judgment

06/22/2021: Declaration of Debra Garfinkle in Support of Application for Default Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

06/22/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

06/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal on the on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY unless judgment/dismissal is entered.; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion set Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion set Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summary of the Case by Plaintiff Southern California Edison Company in Support of Application for Final Judgment; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Ruling on Ex Parte Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application for Order Expediting the Processing of the Complaint in Eminent Domain on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUHN BRADFORD B.