This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 09:11:05 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK, NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS

PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

CASTLE & COOKE ALBERHILL HOME BUILDING, INC

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC

GLADDING, MCBEAN & CO

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

GENERAL TELEPHONE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ANY PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TILE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

LOS ANGELES PRESSED BRICK COMPANY

HORSETHIEF CANYON PARTNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford Beau Kuhn

Defendant Attorneys

Sean P O'Connor

Bruce G. Fordon

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Document Return.

04/28/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal

05/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing

09/09/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/09/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

09/01/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Declaration of Bradford B. Kuhn in response to order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file proof of service on all Defendants

08/30/2021: Declaration of Bradford B. Kuhn in response to order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file proof of service on all Defendants

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

08/27/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

08/19/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

08/26/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on all defendants (CRC 3.110.(b)&(f))

08/18/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on all defendants (CRC 3.110.(b)&(f))

Certificate of Mailing

08/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on all defendants (CRC 3.110.(b)&(f)) as to Bradford Beau Kuhn, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC; CASTLE & COOKE ALBERHILL HOME BUILDING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Bradford B. Kuhn in response to order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file proof of service on all Defendants; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Denied- Ex Parte Application for Order Expediting the Processing of the Complaint in Eminent Domain; Declaration of Debra Garfinkle; Order; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application for order expediting the processing of the Complaint in Eminent Domain; Declaration of Debra Garfinkle; [Proposed] Order on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint in Eminent Domain; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 05/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLADDING, MCBEAN & CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Coast Building Products Inc ind and as successor in interest to Alcal Specialty Contracting Inc et al is a litigant