This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 09:02:47 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & FAVERO

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY FAVERO was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0779

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

MELINDA ANNE FAVERO

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TITLE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

STEVEN FAVERO

JUDY KIMES

SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY

GREAT COAST OIL CORPORATION

SCOTT SOTELLO

RONALD KIMES

TAMERA PEZNINA

ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

THE HEIRS OF DEVISEES OF RONALD KIMES, DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SAID DECEDENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Bradford Beau Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/09/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/09/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/09/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/09/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/09/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/09/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Declaration of due diligence with return of service

04/09/2021: Declaration of due diligence with return of service

Request for Dismissal

05/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

05/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

10/08/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

10/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

10/18/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

DECLARATION OF DEBRA GARFINKLE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL DEFENDANTS on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

10/18/2021: DECLARATION OF DEBRA GARFINKLE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF ALL DEFENDANTS on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

10/19/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

10/19/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

10/25/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

10/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

10/25/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal on the on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY unless judgment/dismissal is entered.; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g) as to Bradford Beau Kuhn, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g) as to Bradford Beau Kuhn, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/23/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3004 Receipt No.: 20210223-00171.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application for order expediting the processing of the Complaint in Eminent Domain; Declaration Garfinkle; [Proposed] order on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint in Eminent Domain; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant