This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:31:49 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & CLEMENTS

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY CLEMENTS was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2123

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

EFFAT YOUSSEF

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TITLE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY

LAKE ELSINORE ASSOCIATES I, L.P

FIRST-CITIZEN BANK & TRUST COMPANY

SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY

RHONDA CLEMENTS

ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford B. Kuhn

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

04/27/2021: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

04/27/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

04/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

05/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME)

05/25/2021: Amendment to COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME)

Notice of Deposit

05/12/2021: Notice of Deposit

Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]

05/12/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]

Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion in Support of Deposit (CCP 1255.020(B))

05/12/2021: Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion in Support of Deposit (CCP 1255.020(B))

Request for Dismissal

06/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Document Return.

06/22/2021: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Amendment to Complaint and Order as to South Elsinore Mutual; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Amendment to Complaint and Order as to South Elsinore Mutual; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summary of the Basis for Appraisal Opinion in Support of Deposit (CCP 1255.020(B)); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Deposit; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210511-00393.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH ELSINORE MUTUAL WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA ANA WATERSHED PROJECT AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where First Citizens Bank is a litigant