This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2021 at 10:11:45 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY & CASTLE & COOKE ALBERHILL HOME BUILDING INC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY CASTLE COOKE ALBERHILL HOME BUILDING INC was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1177

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Defendants

CASTLE & COOKE ALBERHILL HOME BUILDING INC

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN OR TITLE TO THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED HEREIN

WELLS FARGO BANK

GENERAL TELEPHONE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford Beau Kuhn Lisa A DeLorme

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Certificate of Mailing

09/08/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/08/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

08/26/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

08/20/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Notice of Ruling re: Order of Prejudgment Possession

06/15/2021: Notice of Ruling re: Order of Prejudgment Possession

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

06/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

06/15/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION (APN 389-020-052)

06/15/2021: ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION (APN 389-020-052)

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

05/21/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession; Declaration of Jillian Friess

05/18/2021: Reply in Support of Unopposed Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession; Declaration of Jillian Friess

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

05/03/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

04/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Request for Dismissal

04/05/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Deposit

03/22/2021: Notice of Deposit

Request for Dismissal

03/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

03/17/2021: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion for Order for Prejudgment Possession on Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/16/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3004 Receipt No.: 20210316-00016.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000); Filed By: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation (Over $25,000) of SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant