This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 03:03:07 (UTC).

SOTO vs DIVERSIFIED ROOFING SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SOTO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DIVERSIFIED ROOFING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2848

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADRIAN SOTO

Defendant

DIVERSIFIED ROOFING SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AANAND MEHTANI

Defendant Attorney

ANGELINA MARIA PLUMTREE

 

Court Documents

Complaint Retaliation in Violation of Labor Code Section 1102.5

07/01/2021: Complaint Retaliation in Violation of Labor Code Section 1102.5

Certificate of Counsel.

07/01/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/01/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

07/01/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Return.

07/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Summons Issued and Filed

07/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Plaintiffs Peremptory Challenge and Motion for Reassignment of Judge; Declaration of Douglas Younglove in support thereof

07/14/2021: Plaintiffs Peremptory Challenge and Motion for Reassignment of Judge; Declaration of Douglas Younglove in support thereof

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

07/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Answer to Adrian Soto Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO

09/07/2021: Answer to Adrian Soto Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO

09/30/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/07/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210907-00338.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Adrian Soto Unverified Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO; Filed By: DIVERSIFIED ROOFING SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiffs Peremptory Challenge and Motion for Reassignment of Judge; Declaration of Douglas Younglove in support thereof; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/01/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210701-00146.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Retaliation in Violation of Labor Code Section 1102.5; Filed By: ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN SOTO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLUMTREE ANGELINA MARIA