This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 15:24:56 (UTC).

SMITH vs MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 SMITH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8627

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYBA SMITH

Defendants

SORAYA INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AUTO GALLERY MITSUBISHIMURRIETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER LOVASZ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

10/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

10/08/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

10/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

10/07/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

10/07/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH

10/22/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH

10/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH; Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH; Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/08/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211008-00183.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of KEYBA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SORAYA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER