This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 08:08:21 (UTC).

SMITH vs NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 SMITH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tamara L. Wagner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tamara L. Wagner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES W SMITH

Defendants

LOANCARE, LLC

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

01/03/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

01/04/2023: Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

01/04/2023: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) – Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

Declaration of Charles W Smith

01/09/2023: Declaration of Charles W Smith

Notice of Document Return.

01/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

01/10/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

01/11/2023: Notice of Document Return.

1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

01/12/2023: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person)

First Amended Declaration of Charles W. Smith on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

01/12/2023: First Amended Declaration of Charles W. Smith on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Tamara L. Wagner; Location/Courtroom: Department C2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Tamara L. Wagner; Location/Courtroom: Department C2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: First Amended Declaration of Charles W. Smith on 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH; Filed By: CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person); Filed By: CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/10/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230110-00522.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Charles W Smith; Filed By: CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/04/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230104-01802.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $5,000 but less than or equal to $10,000 (CCP116.230B3); Amount: $75.00; Paid: $75.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/04/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230104-01802.1; Paid: $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person) filed by CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment (Commissioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $5,000 up to $10,000 (Natural Person); Filed By: CHARLES W SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less