This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 20:53:36 (UTC).

SITCHLER vs CULLUM

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 SITCHLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CULLUM. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2550

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM SITCHLER

PRISCILLA RIVERA

ANTHONY SITCHLER

Cross Defendants and Defendants

JASON M CULLUM

CULLUM HAY

R & C LOGISTIC SERVICES LLC

JOSEPH MATTHEW FICHER

AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

R & C LOGISTIC SERVICES LLC

AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Joseph Scott

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

JOHN S. LOWENTHAL

Bradford G. Hughes Hayden S Alfano

Bradford G. Hughes

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford G. Hughes

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

06/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

06/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Notice of Document Return.

07/20/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

10/15/2021: Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

10/15/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Cross-Complaint

10/19/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Document Return.

09/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

09/21/2021: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Answer to Complaint Answer of Cross-Defendants Jason M Cullum, Individually and as dba Cullum Hay and Joseph Matthew Fischer to Cross-Complaint of R&C Logistic Services LLC on Cross-Complaint of R & C LOGISTIC SERVICES LLC

09/13/2021: Answer to Complaint Answer of Cross-Defendants Jason M Cullum, Individually and as dba Cullum Hay and Joseph Matthew Fischer to Cross-Complaint of R&C Logistic Services LLC on Cross-Complaint of R & C LOGISTIC SERVICES LLC

Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Cross-Complaint

09/08/2021: Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Cross-Complaint

Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

09/08/2021: Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

09/08/2021: Defendant and Cross-Complainant R & C Logistic Services LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendants Jason M. Cullum, Individually and as DBA Cullum Hay and Joseph Matthew Ficher sued and served as Doe 1 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort

09/08/2021: Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendants Jason M. Cullum, Individually and as DBA Cullum Hay and Joseph Matthew Ficher sued and served as Doe 1 on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Defendants' Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

09/08/2021: Defendants' Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER by JASON M CULLUM

08/30/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER by JASON M CULLUM

Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Strike Demurrer on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER by JASON M CULLUM

08/30/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Motion to Strike Demurrer on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER by JASON M CULLUM

Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

08/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint/Cross Complaint (Fictitious Name) (RI-CI035) on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

08/23/2021: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2021

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint of AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC; Expiration Date: 11/18/2021; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: JASON M CULLUM; JOSEPH MATTHEW FICHER; AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2021

DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/15/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211015-00498.1; Paid: $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/15/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211015-00498.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: AMERICAN LOGISTICS, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9293 Receipt No.: 20210922-00059.1; Paid: $2.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: JASON M CULLUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of WILLIAM SITCHLER; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/15/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9293 Receipt No.: 20210615-00396.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: WILLIAM SITCHLER; PRISCILLA RIVERA; ANTHONY SITCHLER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less