This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/01/2023 at 09:02:11 (UTC).

SILVA vs GAGNON

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 SILVA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GAGNON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2969

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERIC SILVA

NATALIE SILVA

POSTAL MARKET LLC

Defendants

DRAVEN GAGNON

DRAVEN AND COMPANY LLC

POST N SHIP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY ALAN KURTZ

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

07/25/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

07/25/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

07/25/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/02/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

08/02/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

09/22/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

09/22/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

09/30/2022: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

09/30/2022: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

Request for Dismissal

11/07/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to DEFENDANT(S); Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/07/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221107-01195.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: HERIC SILVA; NATALIE SILVA; POSTAL MARKET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220927-00269.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA; Filed By: HERIC SILVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA; Filed By: HERIC SILVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220802-01227.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220802-01227.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HERIC SILVA; NATALIE SILVA; POSTAL MARKET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: HERIC SILVA; NATALIE SILVA; POSTAL MARKET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HERIC SILVA; NATALIE SILVA; POSTAL MARKET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: HERIC SILVA; NATALIE SILVA; POSTAL MARKET LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of HERIC SILVA; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 11/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less