This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/22/2022 at 00:50:14 (UTC).

SHAY vs COUTS HEATING/COOLING

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 SHAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUTS HEATING/COOLING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4555

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALISON JOAN SHAY

Defendants

COUTS HEATING/COOLING

SAMNA DELAMORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLIN M JONES

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

10/20/2022: Complaint for Damages

Certificate of Counsel.

10/20/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

10/21/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221021-00432.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/21/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221021-00432.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/19/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALISON JOAN SHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALISON JOAN SHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: ALISON JOAN SHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALISON JOAN SHAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES COLIN M