This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 13:35:30 (UTC).

SHAW vs PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 SHAW filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad Firetag and Lydia Villarreal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4353

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chad Firetag

Lydia Villarreal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Defendants

PARTNERS PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC

ESTHER DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRAHAM KALAF

Defendant Attorneys

THEODORE E. BACON

AUTUMN L. MOORE

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal - Esther Doe

07/12/2023: Order of Dismissal - Esther Doe

Trial Setting Order

07/11/2023: Trial Setting Order

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

07/11/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

07/11/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

07/11/2023: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)). as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

07/11/2023: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)). as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Substitution of Attorney

07/07/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

06/26/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

06/26/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

06/15/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

06/15/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

04/07/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)).

04/07/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)).

Certificate of Mailing

04/07/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/05/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

04/05/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

04/05/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

03/28/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2024
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order of Dismissal - Esther Doe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Lydia Villarreal; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)). as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW; Judicial Officer: Lydia Villarreal; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW; Judicial Officer: Lydia Villarreal; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on Esther Doe pursuant to (CRC 3.110(b & f)). as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to AVRAHAM KALAF, JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Trial Setting Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW; Filed By: JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221011-01592.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221011-01592.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages; Filed By: JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of JAWAIN ADAM SHAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less