This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/30/2021 at 02:42:00 (UTC).

SHAPIRO vs SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 SHAPIRO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6190

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

Defendants

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

THE MORTGAGE LAW FIRM PLC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

12/28/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

Minute Order: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER

12/28/2021: Minute Order: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND W on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

12/27/2021: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND W on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

12/27/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Declaration of PLAINTIFF APPLICATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

12/27/2021: Declaration of PLAINTIFF APPLICATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

12/27/2021: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

Summons Issued and Filed

12/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/27/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

12/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/27/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Plaintiffs Verified Complaint

12/27/2021: Plaintiffs Verified Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingType: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6880 Receipt No.: 20211228-00511.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/27/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20211227-00017.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/27/2021; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: 20211227-00006.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 02/25/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of PLAINTIFF APPLICATION OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN PRO PER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiffs Verified Complaint; Filed By: DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of DONALD RAY SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MORTGAGE LAW FIRM PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant