This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2023 at 10:56:00 (UTC).

SARSON vs HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 SARSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0609

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURENCE SARSON

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL AZIZI

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/19/2023: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

01/19/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

02/01/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/01/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230201-00586.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230201-00586.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/20/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less