This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/03/2023 at 09:02:18 (UTC).

SARSON vs HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 SARSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel M. Bermudez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0609

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Angel M. Bermudez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURENCE SARSON

Defendants

HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL AZIZI

Defendant Attorney

PETER WILLIAM DYE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

01/19/2023: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

01/19/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

02/01/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

02/01/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

02/21/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

03/20/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

03/20/2023: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

03/20/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Notice of Change of Firm Address on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

04/25/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Address on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

07/17/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

07/17/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC Set

07/19/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC Set

Certificate of Mailing

07/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion TSC Set; Judicial Officer: Angel M. Bermudez; Location/Courtroom: Department S302; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion TSC Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/17/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230717-00804.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON; Filed By: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/26/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230426-00832.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Firm Address on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230201-00586.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230201-00586.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of LAURENCE SARSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less