This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 05:14:43 (UTC).

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA vs COULTER

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COULTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candice Garcia-Rodrigo and Marie E. Wood. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3274

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candice Garcia-Rodrigo

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendant

KOBY COULTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Allen Rosenberg

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

09/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000)

04/16/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

04/16/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

04/16/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

04/26/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000) of SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

04/26/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000) of SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/26/2021; Fine Description: Check #9175 Receipt No.: 20210426-00180.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000) of SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000); Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Under $10,000) of SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenberg, Gary Allen