This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 19:26:57 (UTC).

RUTKOFF vs KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 RUTKOFF filed an Other lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey M. Zimel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5109

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey M. Zimel

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Minors

JARED RUTKOFF

COLEMAN RUTKOFF

CAMERYN RUTKOFF

Respondents

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Minor Attorney

Patricia Anne Law

Attorney at Patricia Anne Law

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

08/05/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

Certificate of Mailing

08/05/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

08/05/2021: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

07/19/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

Notice of Hearing Dat for Petition for Order

06/24/2021: Notice of Hearing Dat for Petition for Order

Notice of Department Assignment

06/16/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

06/16/2021: Notice of Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

Certificate of Counsel.

06/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

06/15/2021: Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem; Judicial Officer: Jeffrey M. Zimel; Location/Courtroom: Department S101; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Hearing Dat for Petition for Order; Filed By: JARED RUTKOFF; COLEMAN RUTKOFF; CAMERYN RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/16/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0255 Receipt No.: 20210616-00319.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JARED RUTKOFF; COLEMAN RUTKOFF; CAMERYN RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JARED RUTKOFF; COLEMAN RUTKOFF; CAMERYN RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem; Filed By: JARED RUTKOFF; COLEMAN RUTKOFF; CAMERYN RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Other Petition (Over $25,000) of JARED RUTKOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant