This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 07:41:25 (UTC).

RUIZ vs 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against 20/20 PLUMBING HEATING, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1975

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

Defendants

EDGAR ISAAC ORTEGA VALDEZ

20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jake Douglass

Defendant Attorney

Michael D. Hirsch

 

Court Documents

Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

07/21/2021: Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

06/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

Notice of Document Return.

06/08/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Answer to Plaintiff, Dolores Victoria Ruiz's, Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

06/03/2021: Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Answer to Plaintiff, Dolores Victoria Ruiz's, Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

05/11/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

04/28/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

04/23/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

04/23/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

04/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

04/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210723-00220.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating Inc and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ; Filed By: 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.; EDGAR ISAAC ORTEGA VALDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6148 Receipt No.: 20210610-00618.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/10/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6148 Receipt No.: 20210610-00618.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendants, 20/20 Plumbing & Heating, Inc. and Edgar Isaac Ortega Valdez's, Answer to Plaintiff, Dolores Victoria Ruiz's, Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ; Filed By: 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.; EDGAR ISAAC ORTEGA VALDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210428-00674.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/28/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210428-00674.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed By: DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DOLORES VICTORIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 20/20 PLUMBING & HEATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS JAKE