This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 01:12:35 (UTC).

RUBIO vs LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 RUBIO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1604

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEDRO RUBIO

Defendant

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABBAS KAZEROUNIAN

Defendant Attorney

Teresa C. Chow

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint for Violations of: 1. California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018, Cal. Civ. Code 1798.100, et seq.

04/21/2022: Class Action Complaint for Violations of: 1. California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018, Cal. Civ. Code 1798.100, et seq.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

04/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010)

Certificate of Counsel.

04/21/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

04/21/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference

04/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

04/25/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of PEDRO RUBIO

04/29/2022: Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of PEDRO RUBIO

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference - Complex; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220502-00802.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal on Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of PEDRO RUBIO; Filed By: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220425-00958.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220425-00958.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220425-00958.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PEDRO RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: PEDRO RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Complex) (CM-010); Filed By: PEDRO RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Class Action Complaint for Violations of: 1. California Consumer Privacy Act of 2018, Cal. Civ. Code 1798.100, et seq.; Filed By: PEDRO RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice (Over $25,000) of PEDRO RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.