This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 01:45:46 (UTC).

ROSSLAND TEN, LLC vs ANYTIME HAWAIIAN, INC

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 ROSSLAND TEN, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANYTIME HAWAIIAN, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2099

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

Defendants

JESSE ROY GARCIA

ANYTIME HAWAIIAN, INC

JESSE R GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN ERAMO

 

Court Documents

Complaint For Breach Of Lease; Breach Of Guaranty; Attorney's Fees

05/23/2022: Complaint For Breach Of Lease; Breach Of Guaranty; Attorney's Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

05/23/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/23/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

05/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/25/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

06/01/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

06/01/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/01/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220601-01380.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220525-01396.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/25/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220525-01396.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint For Breach Of Lease; Breach Of Guaranty; Attorney's Fees; Filed By: ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ROSSLAND TEN, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSSLAND TEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERAMO, MARTIN PETER