This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 01:09:40 (UTC).

ROSS vs RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 ROSS filed an Other lawsuit against RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4009

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYNTHIA ROSS

EBONY PARKER

MONICA MEILLEUR

EBONY PARKER AND MONICA MEILLEUR

Defendants

RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LLC

KND DEVELOPMENT 54, LLC

ALTA VISTA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KINDRED HOSPITAL RIVERSIDE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KINDRED HEALTHCARE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ANDREW SCOTT

JULIE CORPUZ

WILLIAM MITCHELL

KATHRYN JOHNSON

JOHN DOES OR JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 300

BLACK AND WHITE CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10 AND BLACK AND WHITE PARTNERSHIPS 1 THOUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREDERICK RISPOLI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/02/2021: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

09/02/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/02/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/02/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

09/03/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/03/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

03/02/2022

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/03/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210903-00029.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/01/2021; Status: Active

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CYNTHIA ROSS; EBONY PARKER; MONICA MEILLEUR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CYNTHIA ROSS; EBONY PARKER; MONICA MEILLEUR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CYNTHIA ROSS; EBONY PARKER; MONICA MEILLEUR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint; Filed By: CYNTHIA ROSS; EBONY PARKER; MONICA MEILLEUR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2021

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Over $25,000) of CYNTHIA ROSS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less