Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 06:30:53 (UTC).

ROSE vs RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 ROSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2743

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN ROSE

Defendant

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shane Vincent Hapuarachy

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOHN ROSE

06/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOHN ROSE

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/09/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

06/09/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

06/03/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Summons Issued and Filed

06/03/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

06/03/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/03/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

06/03/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOHN ROSE; Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/09/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210609-00094.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/09/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4190 Receipt No.: 20210609-00094.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JOHN ROSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAPUARACHY SHANE V.