This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 13:26:55 (UTC).

ROSALES vs APARIS

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 ROSALES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against APARIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0725

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADRIAN ROSALES

Defendants

ROXANA SAID

ALICE APARIS

BIRKSHIRE HATHAWAY

PACIFIC SOTHEYBY'S INT'L REALTY

ADAM RUTZ RIVERA

PEARSON PROPERTIES, INC.

BERKSHRIE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES DRYSDALE PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luiey Ghaleb Haddad

Defendant Attorneys

R. Ernest Montanari

Shane Abergel Shane Abergel

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

04/02/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

04/02/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

10/08/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

10/15/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Proof of Service re: Request for Dismissal without Prejudice on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

09/07/2021: Proof of Service re: Request for Dismissal without Prejudice on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Notice of Document Return.

09/07/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

09/03/2021: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

09/03/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Certificate of Mailing

09/01/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/01/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Partial Settlement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

08/03/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Notice of Partial Settlement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Notice of Partial Settlement Between Plaintiff Adrian Rosales and Defendants Adam Rutz-Rivera and Pacific Sotheby's Int'l Realty

08/03/2021: Notice of Partial Settlement Between Plaintiff Adrian Rosales and Defendants Adam Rutz-Rivera and Pacific Sotheby's Int'l Realty

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

08/16/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

08/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/16/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

08/09/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

08/03/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

08/03/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Luiey Ghaleb Haddad, ADRIAN ROSALES; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES; Filed By: ROXANA SAID; PEARSON PROPERTIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Luiey Ghaleb Haddad, ADRIAN ROSALES; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service re: Request for Dismissal without Prejudice on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES; Filed By: PEARSON PROPERTIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/18/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4887 Receipt No.: 20210218-00443.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of ADRIAN ROSALES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC SOTHEYBY'S INT'L REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKSHRIE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES DRYSDALE PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Pearson Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haddad, Luiey G