This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 01:02:35 (UTC).

RONQUILLO vs KNIGHT

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 RONQUILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KNIGHT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4739

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICO RONQUILLO

Defendant

ROBERT EDEN KNIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gene Hitoshi Shioda

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

10/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

10/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

10/12/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

10/12/2021: Complaint - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2905 Receipt No.: 20211019-00479.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: No Fee Case Receipt No.: 20211019-00474.1; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: Void / Reversal Receipt No.: 20211019-00474.2; Paid: $450.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2905 Receipt No.: 20211019-00479.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/11/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: NICO RONQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: NICO RONQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: NICO RONQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint - Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death; Filed By: NICO RONQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of NICO RONQUILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIODA GENE HITOSHI