This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 01:22:25 (UTC).

ROJAS vs HONG

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 ROJAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HONG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2220

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASMIN A. ROJAS

Defendants

ANDREW KYUNGTAE HONG

NAE HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL P. BECK

 

Court Documents

Complaint For Personal Injuries

06/01/2022: Complaint For Personal Injuries

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/01/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/01/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

06/02/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/03/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JASMIN A. ROJAS

06/28/2022: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JASMIN A. ROJAS

Notice of Document Return.

06/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/28/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220628-00129.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JASMIN A. ROJAS; Filed By: JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220602-01238.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/02/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220602-01238.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 07/31/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint For Personal Injuries; Filed By: JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JASMIN A. ROJAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK MITCHELL