This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 03:02:45 (UTC).

ROHR vs ALBERTSON'S LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 ROHR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSON'S LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5023

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARI ROHR

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN A FARD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of KARI ROHR

09/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of KARI ROHR

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/24/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

09/24/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/24/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/29/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210929-00511.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/23/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: KEVIN A FARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: KEVIN A FARD; KARI ROHR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: KEVIN A FARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of KARI ROHR; Filed By: KARI ROHR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of KARI ROHR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant