This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 14:54:43 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ vs TRIPLE R TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRIPLE R TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3002

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAVIER RODRIGUEZ

JUANA RODRIGUEZ

ANTONIA MIRANDA

Defendants

TRIPLE R TRANSPORTATION

ALFONSO GARIBAY CORTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hilda H. Zamora

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT TROY BERGSTEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: James Latting; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/25/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210825-00145.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: ALFONSO GARIBAY CORTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUANA RODRIGUEZ; ANTONIA MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/19/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210819-00176.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint; Request for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: TRIPLE R TRANSPORTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1023 Receipt No.: 20210630-00049.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUANA RODRIGUEZ; ANTONIA MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUANA RODRIGUEZ; ANTONIA MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUANA RODRIGUEZ; ANTONIA MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUANA RODRIGUEZ; ANTONIA MIRANDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JAVIER RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGSTEN ROBERT T.