This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 02:07:48 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE vs FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4160

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

Defendants

THE KROGER CO.

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC

FOOD 4 LESS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS, INC

FOOD 4 LESS GM, INC

FOOD 4 LESS

WESTERN AVENUE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel J. Rafii

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

09/14/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

09/13/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/13/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/13/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3059 Receipt No.: 20210914-00869.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3059 Receipt No.: 20210914-00869.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/12/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of MARIA D. RODRIGUEZ ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant