This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 21:04:08 (UTC).

RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7350

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Thomas Humes, JR.

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

08/27/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/27/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/30/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *8421 Receipt No.: 20210830-00165.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 10/26/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of RESIDENCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Residence Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUMES JACK THOMAS