This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 00:49:35 (UTC).

RELIFORD vs THE KROGER CO.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 RELIFORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4450

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

Defendants

THE KROGER CO.

FOOD 4 LESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Angella S Farokhzad

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/29/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/29/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

09/29/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

09/30/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

11/01/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/02/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20211102-00161.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DARREN DONTE RELIFORD; Filed By: DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2753 Receipt No.: 20210930-00661.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2753 Receipt No.: 20210930-00661.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of DARREN DONTE RELIFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant