This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 00:54:07 (UTC).

RASMUSSEN vs TRAVINO

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 RASMUSSEN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against TRAVINO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory J. Olson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2547

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory J. Olson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RALPHS

Not Classified By Court

MARK RASMUSSEN

Other

NASARIO TRAVINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

Jacob Michael Harper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS; Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Personal Service on Restraining Order After Hearing served on 07/12/2021 on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS; Filed By: RALPHS; MARK RASMUSSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Gregory J. Olson; Location/Courtroom: Department 3M; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing (WV-130) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS; Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders; Judicial Officer: Gregory J. Olson; Location/Courtroom: Department 3M; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Continue Court Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order); Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Court Hearing - Workplace Violence Prevention (WV-109) on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Temporary Restraining Order on Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Jacob M. Harper; Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Confidential CLETS Information (CLETS-001); Filed By: RALPHS; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders (WV-100); Filed By: RALPHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketFilings: Petition for Workplace Violence Restraining Orders of RALPHS; Disposition: Court Finding 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARPER JACOB M.